US SR123 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-8-2)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1717; text: 3/18/2021 CR S1653)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1717; text: 3/18/2021 CR S1653)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating March 2021 as "National Women's History Month".
Title
A resolution designating March 2021 as "National Women's History Month".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1717; text: 3/18/2021 CR S1653) |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SR537 (Related) 2022-03-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1013-1014; text: CR S1019)