US SR107 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-14 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4908; text: CR 3/11/2021 S1505-1506)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-14 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4908; text: CR 3/11/2021 S1505-1506)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate relating to the 10th anniversary of the March 11, 2011, earthquake and tsunami in Japan.
Title
A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate relating to the 10th anniversary of the March 11, 2011, earthquake and tsunami in Japan.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Hagerty [R-TN] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-14 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4908; text: CR 3/11/2021 S1505-1506) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 92. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |