US SR106 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 55.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 55.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution condemning Beijing's destruction of Hong Kong's democracy and rule of law.
Title
A resolution condemning Beijing's destruction of Hong Kong's democracy and rule of law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 55. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S802-803) |
Same As/Similar To
HR636 (Related) 2023-07-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.