US SJR9 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-322.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8, of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Securities and Exchange Commission relating to the disclosure of payments by resource extraction issuers. This joint resolution nullifies the "Disclosure of Payments by Resource Extraction Issuers" rule finalized by the Securities and Exchange Commission on July 27, 2016. (The rule, mandated under the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act, requires resource extraction issuers to disclose payments made to governments for the commercial development of oil, natural gas, or minerals.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8, of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Securities and Exchange Commission relating to the disclosure of payments by resource extraction issuers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenateCommittee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-322.
2017-01-30SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S492-493)

Same As/Similar To

HJR41 (Related) 2017-02-14 - Became Public Law No: 115-4. (TXT | PDF)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback