US HJR41 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-14 - Became Public Law No: 115-4. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of a rule submitted by the Securities and Exchange Commission relating to "Disclosure of Payments by Resource Extraction Issuers". This joint resolution nullifies the "Disclosure of Payments by Resource Extraction Issuers" rule finalized by the Securities and Exchange Commission on July 27, 2016. (The rule, mandated under the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act, requires resource extraction issuers to disclose payments made to governments for the commercial development of oil, natural gas, or minerals.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of a rule submitted by the Securities and Exchange Commission relating to "Disclosure of Payments by Resource Extraction Issuers".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-03 - Senate - On the Joint Resolution H.J.Res. 41 (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - On the Motion to Proceed H.J.Res. 41 (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - On Passage (Y: 235 N: 187 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-14SenateBecame Public Law No: 115-4. (TXT | PDF)
2017-02-14SenateSigned by President.
2017-02-06SenatePresented to President.
2017-02-03SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2017-02-03SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 52 - 47. Record Vote Number: 51.
2017-02-03SenateConsidered by Senate. (consideration: CR S663-664)
2017-02-02SenateMeasure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S634-653)
2017-02-02SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 52 - 48. Record Vote Number: 50. (consideration: CR S634)
2017-02-01SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
2017-02-01HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-02-01HouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 235 - 187 (Roll no. 72). (text: CR H848)
2017-02-01HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H858)
2017-02-01HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 41.
2017-02-01HouseRule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 41 and H.J. Res. 40. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on both H.J.Res. 40 and H.J.Res. 41. All points of order against consideration are waived for both joint resolutions.
2017-02-01HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 71. (consideration: CR H848-859)
2017-01-30HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 71 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 41 and H.J. Res. 40. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on both H.J.Res. 40 and H.J.Res. 41. All points of order against consideration are waived for both joint resolutions.
2017-01-30HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
2017-01-30HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR71 (Related) 2017-02-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SJR9 (Related) 2018-05-15 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback