US SJR69 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-19 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-19 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A joint resolution supporting a Diplomatic Solution in Yemen and Condemning the Murder of Jamal Khashoggi. This joint resolution expresses the Senate's belief that Saudi Arabia's Crown Prince Mohammed bin Salman is responsible for the murder of journalist Jamal Khashoggi. It criticizes Saudi Arabia's cooperation with, and military equipment purchases from, Russia and China as challenges to the country's long-term relationship with the United States. The joint resolution calls for an immediate cease-fire in the civil war in Yemen and for the two sides to negotiate a peace agreement. It declares that there is no statutory authority for U.S. involvement in the conflict, including for providing in-air refueling to Saudi aircraft flying missions against the Houthi rebels. The resolution also condemns the Houthi rebels for human rights violations and the government of Iran for supplying them with weapons.
Title
A joint resolution supporting a Diplomatic Solution in Yemen and Condemning the Murder of Jamal Khashoggi.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Corker [R-TN] | Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] |
Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] |
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-19 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-12-19 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S7565-7566; text: CR S7566) |
Same As/Similar To
HCR81 (Related) 2017-10-11 - UNANIMOUS CONSENT - Mr. Collins (GA) asked unanimous consent that the provisions of section 7 of the War Powers Resolution (50 U.S.C. 1546) shall apply to H.Con.Res. 81 not earlier than November 2, 2017, but on the same terms that would have adhered on October 13, 2017. Agreed to without objection.
SB3652 (Related) 2018-11-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SJR54 (Related) 2018-12-19 - Held at the desk.
SB3652 (Related) 2018-11-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SJR54 (Related) 2018-12-19 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Asia
Aviation and airports
China
Conflicts and wars
Crime victims
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
International affairs
Iran
Marine and inland water transportation
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military operations and strategy
News media and reporting
Protest and dissent
Russia
Sanctions
Saudi Arabia
United Arab Emirates
United Nations
Violent crime
War and emergency powers
Women's rights
Yemen
Aviation and airports
China
Conflicts and wars
Crime victims
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
International affairs
Iran
Marine and inland water transportation
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military operations and strategy
News media and reporting
Protest and dissent
Russia
Sanctions
Saudi Arabia
United Arab Emirates
United Nations
Violent crime
War and emergency powers
Women's rights
Yemen