US HCR81 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-3)
Status: Introduced on September 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-11 - UNANIMOUS CONSENT - Mr. Collins (GA) asked unanimous consent that the provisions of section 7 of the War Powers Resolution (50 U.S.C. 1546) shall apply to H.Con.Res. 81 not earlier than November 2, 2017, but on the same terms that would have adhered on October 13, 2017. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-11 - UNANIMOUS CONSENT - Mr. Collins (GA) asked unanimous consent that the provisions of section 7 of the War Powers Resolution (50 U.S.C. 1546) shall apply to H.Con.Res. 81 not earlier than November 2, 2017, but on the same terms that would have adhered on October 13, 2017. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directing the President pursuant to section 5(c) of the War Powers Resolution to remove United States Armed Forces from unauthorized hostilities in the Republic of Yemen. Directs the President to remove U.S. Armed Forces from hostilities in Yemen, except those engaged in operations directed at Al Qaeda in the Arabian Peninsula, within 30 days after adoption of this concurrent resolution, unless: (1) the President requests and Congress authorizes a later date, or (2) a declaration of war or specific authorization for the use of the Armed Forces has been enacted.
Title
Directing the President pursuant to section 5(c) of the War Powers Resolution to remove United States Armed Forces from unauthorized hostilities in the Republic of Yemen.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-11 | House | UNANIMOUS CONSENT - Mr. Collins (GA) asked unanimous consent that the provisions of section 7 of the War Powers Resolution (50 U.S.C. 1546) shall apply to H.Con.Res. 81 not earlier than November 2, 2017, but on the same terms that would have adhered on October 13, 2017. Agreed to without objection. |
2017-09-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2017-09-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
International affairs
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Saudi Arabia
War and emergency powers
Yemen
Congressional oversight
International affairs
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Saudi Arabia
War and emergency powers
Yemen
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-concurrent-resolution/81/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hconres81/BILLS-115hconres81ih.pdf |