US SJR66 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Became Public Law No: 116-138. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Became Public Law No: 116-138. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This joint resolution appoints Denise O'Leary as a citizen regent of the Board of Regents of the Smithsonian Institution.
Title
A joint resolution providing for the appointment of Denise O'Leary as a citizen regent of the Board of Regents of the Smithsonian Institution.
Sponsors
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-138. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-04-10 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-04-03 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-03-31 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-03-31 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H1870) |
2020-03-31 | House | Committee on House Administration discharged. |
2020-03-31 | House | Without objection, the Chair laid before the House S.J. Res. 66. (consideration: CR H1870) |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2020-01-13 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S148; text: CR S148) |
Subjects
Federal officials
Government operations and politics
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Smithsonian Institution
Government operations and politics
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Smithsonian Institution