US SJR60 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Introduced on September 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Failed of passage in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 49 - 49. Record Vote Number: 390.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Failed of passage in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 49 - 49. Record Vote Number: 390.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Department of Education relating to "Final Priorities, Requirements, Definitions, and Selection Criteria-Expanding Opportunity Through Quality Charter Schools Program (CSP)-Grants to State Entities (State Entity Grants); Grants to Charter Management Organizations for the Replication and Expansion of High-Quality Charter Schools (CMO Grants); and Grants to Charter School Developers for the Opening of New Charter Schools and for the Replication and Expansion of High-Quality Charter Schools (Developer Grants)".
Title
A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Department of Education relating to "Final Priorities, Requirements, Definitions, and Selection Criteria-Expanding Opportunity Through Quality Charter Schools Program (CSP)-Grants to State Entities (State Entity Grants); Grants to Charter Management Organizations for the Replication and Expansion of High-Quality Charter Schools (CMO Grants); and Grants to Charter School Developers for the Opening of New Charter Schools and for the Replication and Expansion of High-Quality Charter Schools (Developer Grants)".
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Bill Hagerty [R-TN] |
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] | Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY] |
Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] |
Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] |
Roll Calls
2022-12-14 - Senate - FAILED PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-14 | Senate | Failed of passage in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 49 - 49. Record Vote Number: 390. |
2022-12-14 | Senate | Failed of passage/not agreed to in Senate: Failed of passage in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 49 - 49. Record Vote Number: 390. |
2022-12-14 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7153) |
2022-12-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 640. |
2022-12-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged, by petition, pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 802(c). |
2022-09-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR94 (Same As) 2022-09-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.