US SJR6 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 43-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-10 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure rejected in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 46 - 52. Record Vote Number: 200.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-10 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure rejected in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 46 - 52. Record Vote Number: 200.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses Congress's disapproval of the rule adopted by the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) on December 21, 2010, relating to preserving the open Internet and broadband industry practices. Prohibits such rule from having any force or effect.
Title
A joint resolution disapproving the rule submitted by the Federal Communications Commission with respect to regulating the Internet and broadband industry practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-11-10 - Senate - On the Motion to Proceed S.J.Res. 6 (Y: 46 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-10 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure rejected in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 46 - 52. Record Vote Number: 200. |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S7324-7326) |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S7239-7263) |
2011-11-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 219. |
2011-11-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by petition, pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 802(c). (consideration: CR S7141; text: CR S7141) |
2011-02-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR37 (Same As) 2011-04-13 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 34.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications