US SJR18 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A joint resolution disapproving of the rule submitted by the Department of Homeland Security relating to "Public Charge Ground of Inadmissibility".
Title
A joint resolution disapproving of the rule submitted by the Department of Homeland Security relating to "Public Charge Ground of Inadmissibility".
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] |
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Bill Hagerty [R-TN] | Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] |
Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] |
Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - Senate - On the Joint Resolution S.J.Res. 18 RC# 130 (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | House | Held at the desk. |
2023-05-22 | House | Received in the House. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 50 - 47. Record Vote Number: 130. (text: CR S1701) |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1698-1701) |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 77. |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged, by petition, pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 802(c). |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR41 (Related) 2023-03-08 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.