US SJR18 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the final rule submitted by the Department of the Interior relating to Non-Subsistence Take of Wildlife, and Public Participation and Closure Procedures, on National Wildlife Refuges in Alaska. This joint resolution nullifies the rule finalized by the Department of the Interior on August 5, 2016, relating to non-subsistence takings of wildlife and public participation and closure procedures on National Wildlife Refuges in Alaska.
Title
A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the final rule submitted by the Department of the Interior relating to Non-Subsistence Take of Wildlife, and Public Participation and Closure Procedures, on National Wildlife Refuges in Alaska.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] |
Roll Calls
Senate - On the Joint Resolution H.J.Res. 69 (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-01 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR35 (Related) 2017-01-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HJR49 (Related) 2017-01-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HJR69 (Related) 2017-04-03 - Became Public Law No: 115-20. (TXT | PDF)
HJR49 (Related) 2017-01-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HJR69 (Related) 2017-04-03 - Became Public Law No: 115-20. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Alaska
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Hunting and fishing
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Alaska
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Hunting and fishing
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection