US HJR69 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - Became Public Law No: 115-20. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the final rule of the Department of the Interior relating to "Non-Subsistence Take of Wildlife, and Public Participation and Closure Procedures, on National Wildlife Refuges in Alaska". This joint resolution nullifies the rule finalized by the Department of the Interior on August 5, 2016, relating to non-subsistence takings of wildlife and public participation and closure procedures on National Wildlife Refuges in Alaska.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the final rule of the Department of the Interior relating to "Non-Subsistence Take of Wildlife, and Public Participation and Closure Procedures, on National Wildlife Refuges in Alaska".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-21 - Senate - Passed Senate without amendment RC# 92 (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - On passage RC# 98 (Y: 225 N: 193 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-03SenateBecame Public Law No: 115-20. (TXT | PDF)
2017-04-03SenateSigned by President.
2017-03-27SenatePresented to President.
2017-03-22SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2017-03-21SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 52 - 47. Record Vote Number: 92.
2017-03-21SenateMeasure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S1864-1884)
2017-03-21SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1864)
2017-02-17SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
2017-02-16HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-02-16HouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 225 - 193 (Roll no. 98). (text: CR H1260)
2017-02-16HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1278-1279)
2017-02-16HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.J. Res. 69, the Chair put the question on passage and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Beyer demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on passage until a time to be announced.
2017-02-16HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2017-02-16HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 69.
2017-02-16HouseThe resolution provides for one hour of general debate on both H.J.Res. 43 and H.J.Res. 69; and provides for proceedings during the period from February 17, 2017, through February 24, 2017.
2017-02-16HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 123. (consideration: CR H1259-1268)
2017-02-15HouseRule H. Res. 123 passed House.
2017-02-14HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 123 Reported to House. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on both H.J.Res. 43 and H.J.Res. 69; and provides for proceedings during the period from February 17, 2017, through February 24, 2017.
2017-02-07HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-02-07HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HJR35 (Same As) 2017-01-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HJR49 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HR123 (Related) 2017-02-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SJR18 (Related) 2017-02-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback