US SJR18 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
States that: (1) the U.S. Armed Forces shall be used exclusively to defend and advance U.S. national security interests; (2) the President has failed to provide Congress with a compelling security rationale for current U.S. military activities regarding Libya; and (3) the President shall not deploy, establish, or maintain the presence of units and members of the U.S. Armed Forces on the ground in Libya unless such presence is limited to the immediate personal defense of U.S. government officials (including diplomatic representatives) or to rescuing members of the U.S. Armed Forces from imminent danger. States that Department of Defense (DOD) funds shall not be obligated or expended to: (1) deploy units or members of the U.S. Armed Forces for ground combat operations in Libya unless such deployment is limited solely to rescuing U.S. Armed Forces members from imminent danger; (2) award a contract to a private security contractor for ground activity in Libya; or (3) establish or maintain any presence of units or members of the U.S. Armed Forces or private security contractors on the ground of Libya, unless such presence is limited to the immediate personal defense of U.S. government officials (including diplomatic representatives) or to rescuing U.S. Armed Forces members from imminent danger. Expresses the the sense of Congress that: (1) the President should request authorization from Congress for the continuation of U.S. involvement in ongoing North Atlantic Treaty Organization (NATO) activities in Libya, and (2) Congress should fully debate and consider such request expeditiously. Directs the Secretaries of State and Defense and the Attorney General to transmit to Congress, not later than 14 days after adoption of this joint resolution, a copy of any official document, record, memo, correspondence, or other communication in the possession of such official that was created on or after February 15, 2011, and refers or relates to: (1) consultation or communication with Congress regarding the employment or deployment of the Armed Forces for Operation Odyssey Dawn or NATO Operation Unified Protector, or (2) the War Powers Resolution and Operation Odyssey Dawn or Operation Unified Protector. Directs the President, not later than 14 days after enactment of this joint resolution, to report to Congress describing U.S. security interests and the activities of U.S. Armed Forces in Libya since March 19, 2011.
Title
A joint resolution prohibiting the deployment, establishment, or maintenance of a presence of units and members of the United States Armed Forces on the ground in Libya, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Webb [D-VA] | Sen. Bob Corker [R-TN] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2011-06-08 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3617-3619) |
Same As/Similar To
HR292 (Related) 2011-06-03 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Afghanistan
Africa
Alliances
Appropriations
Asia
Congressional oversight
Defense spending
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Iraq
Jordan
Libya
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Oil and gas
Public contracts and procurement
Qatar
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Terrorism
United Arab Emirates
War and emergency powers
Yemen
Africa
Alliances
Appropriations
Asia
Congressional oversight
Defense spending
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Iraq
Jordan
Libya
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Oil and gas
Public contracts and procurement
Qatar
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Terrorism
United Arab Emirates
War and emergency powers
Yemen
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-joint-resolution/18/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/sjres18/BILLS-112sjres18is.pdf |