US SJR1 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Became Public Law No: 115-18. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Became Public Law No: 115-18. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A joint resolution approving the location of a memorial to commemorate and honor the members of the Armed Forces who served on active duty in support of Operation Desert Storm or Operation Desert Shield. This joint resolution approves the location within Washington, DC and the surrounding area of the National Desert Storm and Desert Shield Memorial authorized to be established under the Carl Levin and Howard P. `Buck' McKeon National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2015.
Title
A joint resolution approving the location of a memorial to commemorate and honor the members of the Armed Forces who served on active duty in support of Operation Desert Storm or Operation Desert Shield.
Sponsors
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] |
Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] |
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] |
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-31 | House | Became Public Law No: 115-18. (TXT | PDF) |
2017-03-31 | House | Signed by President. |
2017-03-20 | House | Presented to President. |
2017-03-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-03-15 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H2063) |
2017-03-15 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H2063-2064) |
2017-03-15 | House | Mr. Tipton asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2017-03-09 | House | Held at the desk. |
2017-03-09 | House | Received in the House. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1695; text: CR S1695) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR3 (Related) 2017-01-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Conflicts and wars
District of Columbia
Iraq
Kuwait
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Monuments and memorials
Conflicts and wars
District of Columbia
Iraq
Kuwait
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Monuments and memorials