US HJR3 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Approving the location of a memorial to commemorate and honor the members of the Armed Forces who served on active duty in support of Operation Desert Storm or Operation Desert Shield. This joint resolution approves the location within Washington, D.C. and the surrounding area of the National Desert Storm and Desert Shield Memorial authorized to be established under the Carl Levin and Howard P. `Buck' McKeon National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2015.
Title
Approving the location of a memorial to commemorate and honor the members of the Armed Forces who served on active duty in support of Operation Desert Storm or Operation Desert Shield.
Sponsors
Rep. David Roe [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2017-01-04 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-01-04 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H62) |
2017-01-04 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.J. Res. 3. |
2017-01-04 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H62-63) |
2017-01-04 | House | Mr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution. |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SJR1 (Related) 2017-03-31 - Became Public Law No: 115-18. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Conflicts and wars
District of Columbia
Iraq
Kuwait
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Monuments and memorials
Conflicts and wars
District of Columbia
Iraq
Kuwait
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Monuments and memorials