US SCR52 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-20 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-20 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to correct the enrollment of S. 3312.
Title
A concurrent resolution to correct the enrollment of S. 3312.
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Senate agreed to the House amendment to S.Con.Res. 52 by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7828) |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill. |
2020-12-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-16 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H7216-7217) |
2020-12-16 | House | H.Amdt.912 On agreeing to the Bass amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-16 | House | H.Amdt.912 Amendment (A001) offered by Ms. Bass. |
2020-12-16 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7216-7217) |
2020-12-16 | House | Ms. Bass asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2020-12-15 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-12-15 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-14 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7470-7471; text: 12/15/2020 CR S7503-7504) |
Same As/Similar To
SB3312 (Related) 2020-12-31 - Became Public Law No: 116-281.