US SB3312 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Became Public Law No: 116-281.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Became Public Law No: 116-281.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Justice to award grants for state and local correctional facilities to provide clinical services for people with serious mental illness who need post-release mental health services.
Title
Crisis Stabilization and Community Reentry Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-31 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-281. |
2020-12-31 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-12-21 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-12-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7213-7214) |
2020-12-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3312. |
2020-12-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: H7213-7216) |
2020-12-16 | House | Ms. Bass moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2020-11-17 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-11-17 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-11-17 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S6713-6714) |
2020-11-16 | Senate | S.Amdt.2684 Amendment SA 2684 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-11-16 | Senate | S.Amdt.2684 Amendment SA 2684 proposed by Senator Cornyn. (consideration: CR S6713-6714; text: CR S6713-6714) In the nature of a substitute. |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6713-6714) |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5909 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB2690 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6094-6095)
SCR52 (Related) 2020-12-20 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SB2690 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6094-6095)
SCR52 (Related) 2020-12-20 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
Community life and organization
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Drug therapy
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement administration and funding
Medical education
Mental health
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Drug therapy
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement administration and funding
Medical education
Mental health