US SB925 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-10 - Became Public Law No: 112-259.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Mt. Andrea Lawrence Designation Act of 2011 - Designates peak 12,240, which is located 0.6 miles northeast of Donahue Peak on the northern border of the Ansel Adams Wilderness and Yosemite National Park in California, as Mt. Andrea Lawrence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mt. Andrea Lawrence Designation Act of 2011

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-20 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 408 N: 7 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-20 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 408 N: 7 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-10HouseBecame Public Law No: 112-259.
2013-01-10HouseSigned by President.
2012-12-31HousePresented to President.
2012-12-20HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2012-12-20HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 408 - 7 (Roll no. 648). (text: CR 12/19/2012 H7319)
2012-12-20HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7414-7415)
2012-12-19HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Grijalva objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
2012-12-19HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 925.
2012-12-19HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7319-7320)
2012-12-19HouseMr. Hastings (WA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2012-05-30HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 135.
2012-05-30HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-506.
2012-04-25HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2012-04-25HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2012-04-25HouseSubcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Discharged.
2011-10-24HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
2011-10-21HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2011-10-21HouseReceived in the House.
2011-10-19SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2011-10-18SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6692)
2011-10-18SenateSenate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6692)
2011-07-28SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 112-214.
2011-05-09SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

HB1818 (Same As) 2012-05-30 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 134.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback