US HB1818 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-30 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 134.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-30 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 134.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mt. Andrea Lawrence Designation Act of 2011 - Designates peak 12,240 located 0.6 miles northeast of Donahue Peak on the northern border of the Ansel Adams Wilderness and Yosemite National Park in California as Mt. Andrea Lawrence.
Title
Mt. Andrea Lawrence Designation Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Howard McKeon [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-30 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 134. |
2012-05-30 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-505. |
2012-04-25 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2012-04-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2012-04-25 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Discharged. |
2012-03-29 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2011-05-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. |
2011-05-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB925 (Same As) 2013-01-10 - Became Public Law No: 112-259.
Subjects
California
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats