US SB920 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-02 - Became Public Law No: 115-80. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-02 - Became Public Law No: 115-80. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
National Clinical Care Commission Act (Sec. 2) This bill establishes within the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) a National Clinical Care Commission to evaluate and make recommendations regarding improvements to the coordination and leveraging of federal programs related to complex metabolic or autoimmune diseases that result from issues related to insulin and represent a significant disease burden (e.g., diabetes). The commission must report on: (1) HHS programs that focus on prevention, (2) current activities and gaps in federal efforts to support clinicians in providing integrated care, (3) improvement in federal education and awareness activities related to prevention and treatment, (4) methods for outreach and dissemination of education and awareness materials, and (5) opportunities for consolidation of overlapping federal programs. The commission must submit an operating plan to HHS and Congress within 90 days of its first meeting. The commission is terminated after it submits a final report, but not later than the end of FY2021.
Title
National Clinical Care Commission Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-02 | House | Became Public Law No: 115-80. (TXT | PDF) |
2017-11-02 | House | Signed by President. |
2017-10-24 | House | Presented to President. |
2017-10-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-10-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7946) |
2017-10-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 920. |
2017-10-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7946-7948) |
2017-10-11 | House | Mr. Olson moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-09-07 | House | Held at the desk. |
2017-09-07 | House | Received in the House. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5019-5020) |
2017-09-06 | Senate | S.Amdt.807 Amendment SA 807 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | S.Amdt.807 Amendment SA 807 proposed by Senator Gardner for Senator Shaheen. (consideration: CR S5019; text: CR S5019) To improve the bill. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5019-5020) |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 47. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander without amendment. Without written report. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Department of Health and Human Services
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Executive agency funding and structure
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Immunology and vaccination
Department of Health and Human Services
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Executive agency funding and structure
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Immunology and vaccination