US SB892 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Opioid Addiction Prevention Act of 2017 This bill amends the Controlled Substances Act to prohibit the Drug Enforcement Administration from registering, or renewing the registration of, a practitioner who is licensed to prescribe opioids in schedule II, III, or IV unless the practitioner agrees to limit an opioid prescription for the initial treatment of acute pain to the lesser of a seven-day supply (no refill) or an opioid prescription limit established under state law. An opioid that is approved and prescribed for the treatment of addiction is not subject to the limit.
Title
Opioid Addiction Prevention Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3964 (Related) 2017-10-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB4408 (Same As) 2017-12-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB4482 (Related) 2018-01-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB4408 (Same As) 2017-12-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB4482 (Related) 2018-01-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health personnel
Licensing and registrations
Prescription drugs
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health personnel
Licensing and registrations
Prescription drugs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/892/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s892/BILLS-115s892is.pdf |