US HB4408 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Opioid Addiction Prevention Act of 2017 This bill amends the Controlled Substances Act to prohibit the Drug Enforcement Administration from registering, or renewing the registration of, a practitioner who is licensed to prescribe opioids in schedule II, III, or IV unless the practitioner agrees to limit an opioid prescription for the initial treatment of acute pain to the lesser of a seven-day supply (no refill) or an opioid prescription limit established under state law. An opioid that is approved and prescribed for the treatment of addiction is not subject to the limit.
Title
Opioid Addiction Prevention Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-11-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-11-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-11-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-11-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3964 (Related) 2017-10-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
SB892 (Same As) 2017-04-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB4482 (Related) 2018-01-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
SB892 (Same As) 2017-04-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB4482 (Related) 2018-01-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health personnel
Licensing and registrations
Prescription drugs
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health personnel
Licensing and registrations
Prescription drugs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4408/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4408/BILLS-115hr4408ih.pdf |