US SB881 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Became Public Law No: 116-181. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Became Public Law No: 116-181. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sets forth provisions concerning improving the ability of the United States to forecast space weather events and mitigate the effects of space weather. The bill provides statutory authority for the National Science and Technology Council's Space Weather Operations, Research, and Mitigation Working Group, which coordinates executive branch efforts regarding space weather. The bill directs the Office of Science and Technology Policy, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA), National Science Foundation, Air Force, Navy, National Aeronautics and Space Administration (NASA), and U.S. Geological Survey to carry out specified space weather activities. NOAA may establish a pilot program under which NOAA offers to enter into contracts with entities in the commercial space weather sector to provide NOAA with space weather data that meets certain standards. The working group must periodically review and update the benchmarks described in the report of the National Science and Technology Council titled Space Weather Phase 1 Benchmarks and dated June 2018, as necessary, based on (1) any significant new data or advances in scientific understanding that become available, or (2) the evolving needs of entities impacted by space weather phenomena.
Title
PROSWIFT Act Promoting Research and Observations of Space Weather to Improve the Forecasting of Tomorrow Act
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-181. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-10-09 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-09-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4455-4458) |
2020-09-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 881. |
2020-09-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4455-4463) |
2020-09-16 | House | Mr. Perlmutter moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2020-07-29 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-07-29 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-07-28 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-07-27 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S4509-4512) |
2020-07-27 | Senate | S.Amdt.2498 Amendment SA 2498 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-07-27 | Senate | S.Amdt.2498 Amendment SA 2498 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Peters. (consideration: CR S4512-4513; text: CR S4509-4512) In the nature of a substitute. |
2020-07-27 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4512-4513) |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 322. |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker without amendment. With written report No. 116-171. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5260 (Related) 2020-01-09 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Atmospheric science and weather
Aviation and airports
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Infrastructure development
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Military facilities and property
Research administration and funding
Science, technology, communications
Spacecraft and satellites
Transportation safety and security
Atmospheric science and weather
Aviation and airports
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Infrastructure development
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Military facilities and property
Research administration and funding
Science, technology, communications
Spacecraft and satellites
Transportation safety and security