US SB859 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 184.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 184.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends through FY2036 authorization and eligibility for the program of hydroelectric production incentives and incentive payments to the owners or operators of hydroelectric facilities at existing dams to make capital improvements directly related to improving efficiency.
Title
RIVER Act Reliable Investment in Vital Energy Reauthorization Act
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 184. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-81. |
2019-07-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3361 (Same As) 2020-12-10 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 611.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Dams and canals
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Dams and canals
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation