US SB849 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-9)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 408.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 408.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Advancing Research for Neurological Diseases Act of 2016 Amends the Public Health Service Act to require the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention to: (1) enhance and expand infrastructure and activities to track the epidemiology of neurological diseases, including multiple sclerosis and Parkinson's disease; and (2) incorporate information obtained through those activities into a National Neurological Diseases Surveillance System. Requires the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to ensure that the System facilitates further research on neurological diseases. Requires HHS to provide for the collection and storage of information on neurological diseases, including the incidence, prevalence, and other information, to the extent practicable. Requires HHS to: (1) make information and analysis in the System available to federal agencies and to the public, including researchers; and (2) ensure that privacy and security protections applicable to the System are at least as stringent as the protections under the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act.
Title
Advancing Research for Neurological Diseases Act of 2016
Sponsors
Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. David Vitter [R-LA] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] |
Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] |
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 408. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB292 (Same As) 2015-01-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6 (Related) 2015-07-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6 (Related) 2015-07-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Government information and archives
Health
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Medical research
Neurological disorders
Government information and archives
Health
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Medical research
Neurological disorders