US HB292 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 82-48)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Advancing Research for Neurological Diseases Act of 2015 Amends the Public Health Service Act to require the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention to: (1) enhance and expand infrastructure and activities to track the epidemiology of neurological diseases, including multiple sclerosis and Parkinson's disease; and (2) incorporate information obtained through those activities into a National Neurological Diseases Surveillance System. Requires the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to ensure that the System facilitates further research on neurological diseases. Requires HHS to provide for the collection and storage of information on neurological diseases, including the incidence, prevalence, and other information, to the extent practicable. Requires HHS to: (1) make information and analysis in the System available to federal agencies and to the public, including researchers; and (2) ensure that privacy and security protections applicable to the System are at least as stringent as the protections under the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act.
Title
Advancing Research for Neurological Diseases Act of 2015
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB849 (Same As) 2016-04-04 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 408.
HB6 (Related) 2015-07-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6 (Related) 2015-07-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Government information and archives
Health
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Medical research
Neurological disorders
Government information and archives
Health
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Medical research
Neurological disorders
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/292/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr292/BILLS-114hr292ih.pdf |