US SB832 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 246.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 246.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AGOA and MCA Modernization Act African Growth and Opportunity Act and Millennium Challenge Act Modernization Act This bill directs the President to establish a website for the collection and dissemination of information regarding the African Growth and Opportunity Act (AGOA). The Department of State is urged to encourage eligible sub-Saharan African countries to use AGOA benefits. The President is urged to: facilitate trans-boundary trade among eligible sub-Saharan African countries; provide AGOA benefits training for business and government trade officials; provide capacity building for African entrepreneurs and trade associations on production strategies, quality standards, and market development; and provide capacity building training. The Millennium Challenge Act of 2003 is amended to permit an eligible country that has entered into a Millennium Challenge Compact to enter into one additional compact. The bill establishes new assistance criteria for a low-income or a lower-middle-income candidate country to enter into a compact with the United States. The Millennium Challenge Corporation shall: (1) before selecting a compact country, provide the Board of Directors with information regarding the country's treatment of civil society; and (2) assess the feasibility of developing subnational partnerships.
Title
AGOA and MCA Modernization Act African Growth and Opportunity Act and Millennium Challenge Act Modernization Act
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 246. |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3445 (Related) 2018-04-23 - Became Public Law No: 115-167. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Africa
Business education
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
International affairs
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Terrorism
Business education
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
International affairs
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Terrorism