US HB3445 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Became Public Law No: 115-167. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Became Public Law No: 115-167. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AGOA and MCA Modernization Act African Growth and Opportunity Act and Millennium Challenge Act Modernization Act This bill directs the President to establish a website for the collection and dissemination of information regarding the African Growth and Opportunity Act (AGOA). The Department of State is urged to promote the use by eligible sub-Saharan African countries of the benefits available under the African Growth and Opportunity Act. The President is urged to: facilitate trans-boundary trade among eligible sub-Saharan African countries; provide training for business and government trade officials on accessing AGOA benefits; provide capacity building for African entrepreneurs and trade associations on production strategies, quality standards, and market development; provide capacity building training to promote product diversification and value-added processing; and provide capacity building and technical assistance funding to help African businesses and institutions comply with U.S. counter-terrorism policies. The Millennium Challenge Act of 2003 is amended to permit an eligible country that has entered into a Millennium Challenge Compact to enter into one additional compact under specified conditions. The bill establishes, beginning with FY2013, new assistance criteria for a low-income or a lower middle income candidate country eligible to enter into a Millennium Challenge Compact with the United States. The Millennium Challenge Corporation shall: (1) before selecting a compact country, provide the Board of Directors with information regarding the country's treatment of civil society; and (2) submit an assessment of the feasibility of developing partnerships at the sub national level within candidate countries.
Title
AGOA and MCA Modernization Act African Growth and Opportunity Act and Millennium Challenge Act Modernization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Edward Royce [R-CA] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] |
Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] | Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA] |
Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-167. (TXT | PDF) |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2015) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 304. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2018-01-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-01-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H430-432) |
2018-01-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3445. |
2018-01-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H430-435) |
2018-01-17 | House | Mr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-01-03 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 358. |
2018-01-03 | House | Reported by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 115-484. |
2017-09-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-09-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-07-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2017-07-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB832 (Related) 2017-10-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 246.
Subjects
Africa
Business education
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
International affairs
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Terrorism
Business education
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
International affairs
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Terrorism