US SB816 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 175.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 175.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that an application for the exportation of natural gas that does not exceed 51.75 billion cubic feet per year shall be deemed consistent with the public interest and granted by the Federal Power Commission without modification or delay. Applications for exportation of natural gas to any nation subject to sanctions imposed by the United States may not be expedited.
Title
Small Scale LNG Access Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] |
Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 175. |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2019 without amendment. With written report No. 116-73. |
2019-07-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1836 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.