US SB800 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 407.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 407.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enhancing the Stature and Visibility of Medical Rehabilitation Research at the NIH Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to revise requirements for medical rehabilitation research. The purpose of the National Center for Medical Rehabilitation Research (NCMRR) is revised to include coordination of research and research training. The NCMRR must develop and periodically update a comprehensive research plan for medical rehabilitation research. Currently, this research plan is developed and updated by the Eunice Kennedy Shriver National Institute of Child Health and Human Development. Prior to updating the research plan, the NCMRR must report on progress in achieving the goals and objectives described in the plan. The Medical Rehabilitation Coordinating Committee must periodically host a scientific conference or workshop on medical rehabilitation research.
Title
Enhancing the Stature and Visibility of Medical Rehabilitation Research at the NIH Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 407. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1469 (Same As) 2015-03-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1631 (Same As) 2015-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1631 (Same As) 2015-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Disability and paralysis
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medical research
National Institutes of Health (NIH)
Research administration and funding
Department of Health and Human Services
Disability and paralysis
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medical research
National Institutes of Health (NIH)
Research administration and funding