US SB794 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-07-20 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-07-20 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to require a pilot program on the participation of non-asset-based third-party logistics providers in the Customs-Trade Partnership Against Terrorism.
Title
CTPAT Pilot Program Act of 2023 Customs Trade Partnership Against Terrorism Pilot Program Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-20 | House | Held at the desk. |
2023-07-20 | House | Received in the House. |
2023-07-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2023-07-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2023-07-18 | Senate | S.Amdt.934 Amendment SA 934 proposed by Senator Schumer for Senator Cornyn. (consideration: CR S3118) To specify that no additional funds are authorized to be appropriated for the purpose of carrying out the Act. |
2023-07-18 | Senate | S.Amdt.934 Amendment SA 934 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2023-07-18 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S3118; text: CR S3118) |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 67. |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. With written report No. 118-27. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2670 (Related) 2023-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 118-31.
SB2226 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Senate ordered measure printed as passed.
HB6876 (Related) 2023-12-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
SB2226 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Senate ordered measure printed as passed.
HB6876 (Related) 2023-12-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.