US SB737 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-24 - Became Public Law No: 116-102. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-24 - Became Public Law No: 116-102. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies National Science Foundation (NSF) grant programs that support STEM (science, technology, engineering, and mathematics, including computer science) education. (Sec. 3) The bill instructs the NSF, when awarding grants under the Discovery Research PreK-12 program, to improve the focus of research and development on elementary and prekindergarten education. (Sec. 4) The bill specifies that NSF grants to increase the participation of underrepresented populations in STEM fields may be used for research into various subjects regarding female students in prekindergarten through elementary school, including the role of teachers and caregivers in encouraging or discouraging participation by such students in STEM activities, and the types of STEM activities that encourage greater participation by such students. (Sec. 5) The bill specifies that NSF grants to research computer science education and computational thinking may be used to support development and implementation of various tools and models for teaching and learning, including developing and offering female-inclusive computer science enrichment programs, and acquainting female students in prekindergarten through elementary school with careers in computer science.
Title
Building Blocks of STEM Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-24 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-102. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-12-24 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2019-12-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-12-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9362) |
2019-12-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 737. |
2019-12-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9362-9363) |
2019-12-09 | House | Ms. Johnson (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-10-01 | House | Held at the desk. |
2019-10-01 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-09-27 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-09-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. |
2019-09-26 | Senate | S.Amdt.944 Amendment SA 944 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-09-26 | Senate | S.Amdt.944 Amendment SA 944 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Rosen. (consideration: CR S5760-5761; text: CR S5760-5761) In the nature of a substitute. |
2019-09-26 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5760-5761) |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 180. |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2019 without amendment. With written report No. 116-78. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1665 (Same As) 2019-07-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Computers and information technology
Education programs funding
Educational technology and distance education
Elementary and secondary education
Preschool education
Research administration and funding
Science and engineering education
Science, technology, communications
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Women's education
Education programs funding
Educational technology and distance education
Elementary and secondary education
Preschool education
Research administration and funding
Science and engineering education
Science, technology, communications
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Women's education