US SB732 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 586.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 586.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to strengthen Buy American requirements, and for other purposes.
Title
BuyAmerican.gov Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 586. |
2022-12-05 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 117-227. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5395 (Same As) 2021-09-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.