US SB715 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, And Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, And Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removing Outdated Restrictions to Allow for Job Growth Act This bill directs the Department of Agriculture, if requested in writing by the city of Old Town, Maine, to release, convey, and quitclaim to the city, without monetary consideration, all rights, title, and interest of the United States in and to lands that: (1) were conveyed by the federal government to the city under the Bankhead-Jones Farm Tenant Act by the deed dated June 5, 1941, and (2) are proposed for conveyance by the city for the purpose of economic development.
Title
Removing Outdated Restrictions to Allow for Job Growth Act
Sponsors
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1177 (Same As) 2018-03-26 - Became Public Law No: 115-156. (TXT | PDF)
SB2099 (Related) 2017-11-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 262.
SB2099 (Related) 2017-11-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 262.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/715/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s715/BILLS-115s715is.pdf |