US SB2099 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 262.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 262.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Land Management Act of 2017 This bill directs the Department of Agriculture (USDA), upon request of the city of Old Town, Maine, to convey to the city without consideration lands that: (1) were conveyed by the federal government to the city under the Bankhead-Jones Farm Tenant Act by the deed dated June 5, 1941, and (2) are proposed for conveyance for the purpose of economic development. The bill authorizes the USDA to sell or exchange 30 tracts of National Forest System land in Georgia totaling approximately 3,841 acres. The bill designates specified federal lands in the Cherokee National Forest in Tennessee as wilderness and as additions to the National Wilderness Preservation System. The bill requires specified lands in the George Washington National Forest (a part of the George Washington and Jefferson National Forests in Virginia, West Virginia, and Kentucky) to be: (1) incorporated in the Rough Mountain Wilderness, and (2) designated as a potential wilderness area for eventual incorporation in the Rich Hole Wilderness. The bill authorizes USDA to sell specified federal land in Winn Parish, Louisiana. USDA shall convey a portion of that land to Collins Camp Properties, Inc. The bill directs USDA to sell and quitclaim a parcel of real property, including improvements, located at 4500 Glenwood Drive in Riverside, California, consisting of approximately 8.75 acres and administered by the Natural Resources Conservation Service, to the Riverside Corona Resource Conservation District.
Title
Federal Land Management Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 262. |
2017-11-16 | Senate | Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. Reported by Senator Roberts without amendment. Without written report. |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1177 (Related) 2018-03-26 - Became Public Law No: 115-156. (TXT | PDF)
HB1434 (Related) 2017-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB2218 (Related) 2017-05-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB2941 (Related) 2017-11-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
HB3567 (Related) 2017-11-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB571 (Related) 2017-03-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB715 (Related) 2017-03-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB973 (Related) 2017-04-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB1975 (Related) 2017-10-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6465)
SB2031 (Related) 2017-10-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
HB1434 (Related) 2017-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB2218 (Related) 2017-05-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB2941 (Related) 2017-11-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
HB3567 (Related) 2017-11-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB571 (Related) 2017-03-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB715 (Related) 2017-03-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB973 (Related) 2017-04-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB1975 (Related) 2017-10-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6465)
SB2031 (Related) 2017-10-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Subjects
California
Economic development
Forests, forestry, trees
Georgia
Land transfers
Louisiana
Maine
Public lands and natural resources
Tennessee
Virginia
Water quality
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Economic development
Forests, forestry, trees
Georgia
Land transfers
Louisiana
Maine
Public lands and natural resources
Tennessee
Virginia
Water quality
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats