US SB697 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-18-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-18 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-18 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to require the Secretary of the Treasury to mint commemorative coins in recognition of the Bicentennial of Harriet Tubman's birth.
Title
Harriet Tubman Bicentennial Commemorative Coin Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-02-18 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S801-802) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S801-802) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1842 (Same As) 2022-08-03 - Became Public Law No: 117-163.