US SB662 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Fair Day in Court for Kids Act of 2019 This bill authorizes the Department of Justice (DOJ) to appoint or provide counsel, at the government's expense, to aliens in removal proceedings and related appeals. An unaccompanied alien child shall be represented by counsel paid for and appointed by the government at every stage of such proceedings. The Department of Homeland Security (DHS) shall provide a complete copy of an alien's immigration file to the alien (or the alien's counsel) within seven days of a notice to appear for an immigration proceeding, and failure to provide the file shall result in a delay in the proceeding. DHS shall provide access to counsel for all detained aliens. The bill authorizes the DOJ to enter into contacts or award grants for providing immigration-related legal services to children. The Executive Office for Immigration Review shall develop model guidelines for representing alien children in immigration proceedings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fair Day in Court for Kids Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Same As/Similar To

SB1445 (Related) 2019-05-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S2820-2831)
SB2113 (Related) 2019-07-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB3918 (Related) 2019-08-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback