US SB2113 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-2)
Status: Introduced on July 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Stop Cruelty to Migrant Children Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stop Cruelty to Migrant Children Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Same As/Similar To

SB292 (Related) 2019-01-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S802-803)
SB662 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1733 (Related) 2019-06-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3256; text: CR S2356-3258)
HB3918 (Same As) 2019-08-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Aging
Appropriations
Border security and unlawful immigration
Child care and development
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Disability and paralysis
Domestic violence and child abuse
Employment and training programs
Family relationships
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Health technology, devices, supplies
Immigrant health and welfare
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Judges
Judicial procedure and administration
Law enforcement officers
Lawyers and legal services
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Members of Congress
Mental health
News media and reporting
Nutrition and diet
Performance measurement
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Specialized courts
Women's health

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback