US SB636 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-14 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-14 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to establish the Dolores River National Conservation Area and the Dolores River Special Management Area in the State of Colorado, to protect private water rights in the State, and for other purposes.
Title
Dolores River National Conservation Area and Special Management Area Act
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. John Hickenlooper [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-14 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2023-07-12 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1534 (Same As) 2023-04-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/636/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s636/BILLS-118s636is.pdf |