US SB585 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-26 - Became Public Law No: 115-73. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Dr. Chris Kirkpatrick Whistleblower Protection Act of 2017 Dr. Chris Kirkpatrick Whistleblower Protection Act of 2017 TITLE I--EMPLOYEES GENERALLY (Sec. 102) This bill directs federal agencies (excluding any entity that is an element of the intelligence community) to give priority to an employee transfer request if the Merit Systems Protections Board (MSPB) grants a stay of a personnel action at the request of: (1) the Office of Special Counsel (OSC) if the OSC determines the personnel action was taken, or is to be taken, as a result of a prohibited personnel practice; or (2) the employee if the individual is in probationary status and seeks corrective action. The Government Accountability Office (GAO) shall report to Congress on retaliation against employees in probationary status. (Sec. 103) The bill: (1) prohibits any employee who has the authority to take a personnel action to access the medical records of another employee or applicant for employment, (2) authorizes disciplinary action against supervisors for retaliation against whistleblowers. (Sec. 105) Agencies must: (1) refer information about employee suicides to the OSC, (2) train supervisors on responding to complaints alleging whistleblower protections violations, (3) provide information regarding whistleblower protections to new employees during probationary periods, (4) inform employees of the role of the OSC and the MSPB with regard to whistleblower protection, and (5) make information about such protections available on agency websites. TITLE II--DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS EMPLOYEES (Sec. 201) The Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) must: (1) submit a plan to prevent unauthorized access to the medical records of VA employees; (2) conduct an outreach program to inform its employees of available mental health services, including telemedicine options; and (3) ensure protocols are in effect to address threats against VA employees providing health care. (Sec. 204) The GAO shall assess the reporting, staffing, accountability, and chain of command structure of the VA police officers at VA medical centers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dr. Chris Kirkpatrick Whistleblower Protection Act of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-12 - House - On Motion to Recommit with Instructions (Y: 190 N: 232 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-10-12 - House - On Passage (Y: 420 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-26HouseBecame Public Law No: 115-73. (TXT | PDF)
2017-10-26HouseSigned by President.
2017-10-24HousePresented to President.
2017-10-12HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-10-12HouseOn passage Passed by recorded vote: 420 - 0 (Roll no. 568). (text: CR H7989)
2017-10-12HouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 190 - 232 (Roll no. 567).
2017-10-12HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8010-8012)
2017-10-12HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the O'Halleran motion to recommit, the Chair put the question on the motion, and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. O'Halleran demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the motion to recommit until a time to be announced.
2017-10-12HouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
2017-10-12HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the O'Halleran motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House forthwith with an amendment to add a new section at the end of title I related to Disclosure of Violations Relating to Air Transportation.
2017-10-12HouseMr. O'Halleran moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. (text: CR H8003)
2017-10-12HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2017-10-12HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on S. 585.
2017-10-12HouseRule provides for consideration of S. 585 with 1 hour of general debate. Bill is closed to amendments. The resolution provides for proceedings during the period from October 16, 2017, through October 20, 2017; and provides for consideration of motions to suspend the rules.
2017-10-12HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 562. (consideration: CR H7998-8004)
2017-10-11HouseRule H. Res. 562 passed House.
2017-10-10HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 562 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of S. 585 with 1 hour of general debate. Bill is closed to amendments. The resolution provides for proceedings during the period from October 16, 2017, through October 20, 2017; and provides for consideration of motions to suspend the rules.
2017-05-26HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
2017-05-26HouseSubcommittee on Oversight and Investigations Discharged.
2017-05-26HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
2017-05-26HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-05-26HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-05-26HouseReceived in the House.
2017-05-25SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2017-05-25SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3190; text as passed Senate: CR S3192-3194)
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 57.
2017-05-04SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 115-44.
2017-03-15SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
2017-03-08SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB3042 (Related) 2017-06-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
HR562 (Related) 2017-10-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback