US SB577 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 157.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 157.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing Accountability Through Transparency Act of 2017 This bill requires the general notice of proposed rule making by a federal agency to include the Internet address of a plain-language summary, not exceeding 100 words, of the proposed rule, which shall be posted on the regulations.gov website.
Title
Providing Accountability Through Transparency Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 157. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment. With written report No. 115-120. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5 (Related) 2017-03-29 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-21.
HB77 (Same As) 2017-01-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
HB77 (Same As) 2017-01-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics