US HB77 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing Accountability Through Transparency Act of 2017 This bill requires the general notice of proposed rule making by a federal agency to include the Internet address of a plain-language summary, not exceeding 100 words, of the proposed rule, which shall be posted on the regulations.gov website.
Title
Providing Accountability Through Transparency Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law. |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5 (Related) 2017-03-29 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-21.
SB577 (Same As) 2017-06-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 157.
SB577 (Same As) 2017-06-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 157.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/77/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr77/BILLS-115hr77ih.pdf |