US SB554 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-16 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-16 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to require the Secretary of Agriculture to conduct a study on the establishment of, and the potential land that could be included in, a unit of the National Forest System in the State of Hawaii, and for other purposes.
Title
A bill to require the Secretary of Agriculture to conduct a study on the establishment of, and the potential land that could be included in, a unit of the National Forest System in the State of Hawaii, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1027) |
Same As/Similar To
HB297 (Same As) 2022-01-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 254.
HR380 (Similar To) 2021-05-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR380 (Similar To) 2021-05-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/554/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s554/BILLS-117s554is.pdf |