US SB537 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Arbitration Fairness Act of 2017 This bill prohibits a predispute arbitration agreement from being valid or enforceable if it requires arbitration of an employment, consumer, antitrust, or civil rights dispute. The validity and enforceability of an agreement to arbitrate shall be determined by a court, under federal law, rather than an arbitrator, irrespective of whether the party resisting arbitration challenges the arbitration agreement specifically or in conjunction with other terms of the contract containing such agreement. Nothing in this bill applies to arbitration provisions in a contract between an employer and a labor organization or between labor organizations, except that no such arbitration provision shall have the effect of waiving the right of an employee to seek judicial enforcement of a right arising under the U.S. Constitution, a state constitution, a federal or state statute, or related public policy.
Title
Arbitration Fairness Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1374 (Same As) 2017-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
HB4570 (Related) 2018-01-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
SB2203 (Related) 2017-12-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2591 (Related) 2018-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB4570 (Related) 2018-01-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
SB2203 (Related) 2017-12-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2591 (Related) 2018-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Competition and antitrust
Consumer affairs
Contracts and agency
Labor-management relations
Law
Competition and antitrust
Consumer affairs
Contracts and agency
Labor-management relations
Law
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/537/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s537/BILLS-115s537is.pdf |