US SB2203 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ending Forced Arbitration of Sexual Harassment Act of 2017 This bill prohibits a predispute arbitration agreement from being valid or enforceable if it requires arbitration of a sex discrimination dispute. The prohibition does not apply to an arbitration provision in a contract between an employer and a labor organization or between labor organizations, subject to limitations.
Title
Ending Forced Arbitration of Sexual Harassment Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1374 (Related) 2017-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
HB4570 (Related) 2018-01-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
SB537 (Related) 2017-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB4734 (Same As) 2018-01-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
HB4570 (Related) 2018-01-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
SB537 (Related) 2017-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB4734 (Same As) 2018-01-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Subjects
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Law
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Law
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/2203/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s2203/BILLS-115s2203is.pdf |