US SB502 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 82.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 82.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to modify the boundary of Voyageurs National Park in the State of Minnesota, and for other purposes. (Sec. 1) This bill modifies the boundaries of Voyageurs National Park in Minnesota. The bill transfers to the National Park Service of the Department of the Interior administrative jurisdiction over: any land managed by the Bureau of Land Management (BLM) within the boundaries of the park, and any additional public land identified by the BLM as appropriate for transfer within the boundaries of the park. Any land located within or adjacent to the boundaries of the park that is owned by Minnesota (or a political subdivision) may be acquired by Interior through donation or exchange only. Upon completion of any such acquisition from Minnesota, Interior shall revise the park's boundaries to reflect the acquisition.
Title
A bill to modify the boundary of Voyageurs National Park in the State of Minnesota, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 82. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-64. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1350 (Same As) 2018-03-14 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 345.