US HB1350 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 345.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To modify the boundary of Voyageurs National Park in the State of Minnesota, and for other purposes. This bill modifies the boundaries of Voyageurs National Park in Minnesota. The bill transfers to the National Park Service of the Department of the Interior administrative jurisdiction over: any land managed by the Bureau of Land Management (BLM) within the boundaries of the park, and any additional public land identified by the BLM as appropriate for transfer within the boundaries of the park. Any land located within or adjacent to the boundaries of the park that is owned by Minnesota (or a political subdivision) may be acquired by Interior through donation or exchange only. Upon completion of any such acquisition from Minnesota, Interior shall revise the park's boundaries to reflect the acquisition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To modify the boundary of Voyageurs National Park in the State of Minnesota, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-14SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 345.
2018-03-13HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-03-13HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1520)
2018-03-13HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1350.
2018-03-13HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1520-1521)
2018-03-13HouseMr. Curtis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2017-12-18HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 349.
2017-12-18HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-470.
2017-12-13HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2017-12-13HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-12-12HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-12-12HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
2017-03-15HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-03-02HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-03-02HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB502 (Same As) 2017-05-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 82.
SB1460 (Related) 2017-09-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback