US SB501 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
East Rosebud Wild and Scenic Rivers Act (Sec. 3) This bill amends the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to designate specified river segments of the East Rosebud Creek in Montana as components of the National Wild and Scenic Rivers System. Nothing in this bill creates a protective perimeter or buffer zone outside of the designated boundary of the designated river segments.
Title
East Rosebud Wild and Scenic Rivers Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-12-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-12-21 | House | Received in the House. |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-12-20 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8185; text: CR S8185) |
2017-05-03 | Senate | An errata sheet on written report No. 115-42 was printed. (text: 115S.Rept.42 errata) |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 56. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-42. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4645 (Same As) 2018-08-02 - Became Public Law No: 115-229. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Forests, forestry, trees
Montana
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Montana
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats