US HB4645 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-02 - Became Public Law No: 115-229. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-02 - Became Public Law No: 115-229. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
East Rosebud Wild and Scenic Rivers Act (Sec. 3) This bill amends the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to designate specified river segments of the East Rosebud Creek in Montana as components of the National Wild and Scenic Rivers System.
Title
East Rosebud Wild and Scenic Rivers Act
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-02 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-229. (TXT | PDF) |
2018-08-02 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-08-01 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5390) |
2018-07-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2018-07-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-07-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6337) |
2018-07-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4645. |
2018-07-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6337-6338) |
2018-07-17 | House | Mr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-05-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 511. |
2018-05-09 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-666. |
2018-04-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-04-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-04-18 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2017-12-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-12-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-12-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB501 (Same As) 2018-01-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.